BASIS (REGISTRATION) LIMITED

Charity number: 1077006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Sprigg Trustee 31 August 2016 None on record
Charles Wright Trustee 21 September 2016 None on record
Richard Fenwick Trustee 08 December 2018 None on record
Stephen Jacob Trustee 14 April 2016 None on record
Sabra Everett Trustee 22 December 2015 None on record
GEOFF DODGSON Trustee None on record
DAVID CAIRNS Trustee 07 May 2013 None on record
David James Bench Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
MRS STEPH MELROSE Trustee None on record
Mrs Emma Hamer Trustee 17 July 2018 None on record
Prof John Moverley Trustee None on record
Susan Twining Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
PETER TAYLOR Trustee 08 June 2011 None on record
David William Burgess Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
Margaret May Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record