BRANDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION HALL

Charity number: 1075364
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £57.32k £25.40k £36.82k £24.45k £8.85k
Total expenditure £45.69k £26.70k £29.06k £35.57k £11.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.65k £0 £12.09k £400 N/A