OLD SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 310348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon John Harvey Trustee 24 October 2019 None on record
Peter Rose Trustee 06 November 2015 None on record
MARIE MACINNES Trustee None on record
Marilyn Elizabeth Joan Callaby Trustee 10 April 2018 None on record
VALERIE MOORE Chair 08 March 2012 None on record
The Very Reverend Joseph Patricius Hawes Trustee 24 October 2019
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN PHILLIPS Trustee 07 September 2011
THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE Received: On time