TOP CHURCH TRAINING

Charity number: 1062241
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 19 October 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 19 October 2020 19 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 16 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 04 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 04 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)