TOP CHURCH TRAINING

Charity number: 1062241
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £36.57k £0 £29.00k £51.27k
Income from government grants £30.67k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £75.70k £51.13k £127.14k £140.41k £181.34k
Total expenditure £76.70k £86.20k £105.06k £108.67k £157.34k