Financial history ST PETERS SCHOOL FUND SCARBOROUGH

Charity number: 1075832
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.22k £10.77k £1.78k £0 £0
Total expenditure £18.23k £19.21k £2.89k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A