Accounts and annual returns THE MYCRO TRUST

Charity number: 1061506
Charity reporting is up to date (130 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 14 June 2024 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 14 June 2024 130 days late
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 19 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 August 2022 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 October 2020 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 October 2020 240 days late Download Open in new window