Financial history THE MYCRO TRUST

Charity number: 1061506
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £34.97k £27.86k £45.55k £18.27k £41.24k
Total expenditure £32.79k £27.40k £31.15k £41.53k £28.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A