GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £464 £501 £505 £511 £525
Total expenditure £300 £0 £122 £0 £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A