CHRISTIAN HOPE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1061526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JON TRINDER Trustee 28 November 2020 None on record
ANTHONY CHRISTOPHER STUART GIBBS Trustee 25 October 2014 None on record
Grant Gooding Trustee 20 October 2018
SOUTHEND VINEYARD
VALERIE JEAN DOBSON Trustee 12 March 2015 None on record
Ian Phillips Chair 13 December 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, COLLIER ROW, ROMFORD Received: On time
AFOLABI JAMES OLADUNJOYE Trustee 09 November 2019 None on record
PATRICIA NELSON Trustee 13 December 2011 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN WHEELER Trustee 25 October 2014 None on record
Paul Edward Guyver Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record