Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY RIBBLE VALLEY BRANCH

Charity number: 1061492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 14 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required