Financial history THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY RIBBLE VALLEY BRANCH

Charity number: 1061492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £23.23k £22.23k £25.00k £24.01k £1.03k
Total expenditure £23.01k £22.61k £23.39k £17.87k £1.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A