Accounts and annual returns CANNOCK CHASE ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1063030
Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 133 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 133 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 February 2023 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 February 2023 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required