Financial history CANNOCK CHASE ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1063030
Charity reporting is overdue by 139 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.05k £11.33k £11.39k £30.86k £25.41k
Total expenditure £14.72k £12.77k £15.31k £15.16k £14.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.95k £11.19k £11.30k £19.36k £24.36k