Accounts and annual returns WOLVERTON SCIENCE AND ART INSTITUTE FUND

Charity number: 310652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 May 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 June 2019 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required