Trustees HENRY GREEN SCHOLARSHIPS IN CONNECTION WITH COUNCIL SCHOOLS

Charity number: 310918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV MARIA HOLMDEN Chair
None on record
Yemi Osho Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
Hather Ali Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
Steve Newton Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Kenneth Nkemnacho Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record
Rashid Akhtar Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
SYLVIA POULSEN Trustee 28 October 2011
None on record
PAT GOUGH VICE CHAIR Trustee
None on record