THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310935
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £387.40k £428.50k £493.33k £476.61k £471.53k
Total expenditure £336.21k £308.19k £287.92k £355.93k £344.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A