Financial history THE BEARD BEQUEST (ICW THE HERTS AND ESSEX HIGH SCHOOL)

Charity number: 311035
Charity reporting is overdue by 120 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £145 £172 £188 £147 £134
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A