LOCKERS PARK SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 311061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 July 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 July 2019 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 14 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 31 December 2015 On time Download