Accounts and annual returns THE NATIONAL CENTRE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 311877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window