NEED AND TAYLORS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 312269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 April 2018 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required