Accounts and annual returns THE ST MARY ABBOTS SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 312393
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 168 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 168 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 January 2020 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 January 2020 67 days late Download Open in new window