THE ST MARY ABBOTS SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 312393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £26.33k £24.76k £25.13k £24.76k £23.13k
Total expenditure £11.83k £4.22k £32.17k £5.25k £36.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A