Financial history SIR WALTER ST.JOHN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 312690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £154.88k £376.77k £223.73k £231.37k £176.98k
Total expenditure £132.62k £222.50k £255.66k £221.73k £167.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A