THE CENTRAL FOUNDATION SCHOOLS OF LONDON

Charity number: 312695
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 July 2019 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 April 2018 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 August 2016 On time Download