MORE HOUSE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 19 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 01 March 2017 On time Download