BUTE HOUSE PREPARATORY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS LIMITED

Charity number: 312739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.81m £4.91m £5.49m £6.33m £5.48m
Total expenditure £4.70m £4.93m £5.19m £5.41m £5.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £102.06k £49.78k £182.81k £900.37k £128.07k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.57m £4.80m £5.26m £5.38m £5.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £38.40k £33.85k £24.01k £24.33k £19.20k
Income - Other £101.28k £25.56k £21.91k £25.83k £5.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.66m £4.93m £5.18m £5.40m £5.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £38.92k £0 £11.09k £4.09k £1.69k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £20.33k £0 £21.59k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0