BUTE HOUSE PREPARATORY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS LIMITED

Charity number: 312739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Mary Rose Thomson Trustee 01 September 2014
QUERCUS CHARITABLE TRUST Overdue by 65 days
SUSAN BAILES Trustee 17 June 2013
IBBY UK SECTION Received: On time
KATHARINE JANE SCOTT KERR Trustee 27 November 2014 None on record
Mark Perry Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
AMANDA BARRON Trustee 04 September 2018 None on record
Polly Mary Ruth McAndrew Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record
Jonathan Paul Beckitt Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record
Dr Michelle Sherman Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Sneha Manhar Pancholi Kooros Trustee 25 June 2015 None on record
JONATHAN BROUGH Trustee 22 April 2021
THE PILGRIMS' SCHOOL Received: On time