NEWCOMEN COLLETT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £182.32k £191.40k £183.69k £166.66k £137.81k
Total expenditure £171.48k £168.74k £203.93k £171.14k £204.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A