Financial history HENRY WOOD ACCOMMODATION TRUST

Charity number: 312839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £132.76k £123.83k £120.98k £108.41k £121.74k
Total expenditure £130.22k £134.23k £135.84k £135.26k £135.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A