Financial history THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS

Charity number: 313000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £26.73m £26.36m £45.02m £21.01m £13.17m
Total expenditure £26.35m £26.10m £44.78m £21.38m £13.26m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.80m £20.66m £38.71m £15.74m £7.90m
Income - Donations and legacies £962.00k £597.00k £548.00k £431.00k £476.00k
Income - Other trading activities £748.00k £901.00k £1.02m £1.07m £1.12m
Income - Charitable activities £24.02m £23.72m £41.90m £18.45m £10.49m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.00m £1.14m £1.20m £1.06m £1.09m
Income - Other £0 £0 £346.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £9.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.64m £25.38m £43.83m £20.13m £12.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £313.00k £263.00k £367.00k £610.00k £335.00k
Expenditure - Governance £76.00k £81.00k £54.00k £60.00k £85.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £101.00k £239.00k £217.00k £230.00k £211.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £92.00k £84.00k £114.00k £102.00k £71.00k
Expenditure - Other £398.00k £451.00k £586.00k £636.00k £703.00k