Financial history ANGLO-DANISH SOCIETY

Charity number: 313202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.30k £37.30k £37.30k £66.88k £23.17k
Total expenditure £30.00k £36.36k £36.36k £64.83k £29.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A