Trustees ANGLO-DANISH SOCIETY

Charity number: 313202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wayne Harber Chair 17 May 2018
None on record
Catherine Elizabeth Schwarck Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Palle Baggesgaard Pedersen Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Christine Bergstedt Jorgensen Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Alan Davey Trustee 16 February 2017
None on record
Bette Petersen Broyd Trustee 26 May 2016
None on record
PETER DAVIS OBE Trustee 27 May 2015
None on record