THE MAUDSLAY SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.44k £18.79k £20.43k £21.59k £14.51k
Total expenditure £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A