THE MAUDSLAY SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR ALEC OSBORN Trustee 30 April 2013 None on record
Dr ROGER KINNS Trustee None on record
Dr Andrew K W Powell OBE Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID PERRETT Trustee 30 April 2013
ASSOCIATION FOR INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY Received: On time
GREATER LONDON INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY Received: On time
Professor Richard William Prager Trustee 02 July 2019 None on record
Richard Henry Maudslay CBE Chair
BRITISH MEXICAN SOCIETY Received: On time
LORD SMITH Trustee 12 July 2016
THE SIXTEEN Received: 1 day late
NATIONAL ART COLLECTIONS FUND Received: On time
THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF VALENCE MARY COMMONLY PEMBROKE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE Received: On time
Dr Jonathan Aylen Trustee 02 July 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR JAN MARIAN MACIEJOWSKI Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record