WOODBROOKE QUAKER STUDY CENTRE

Charity number: 313816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ingrid Greenhow Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
Martina Weitsch Trustee 13 June 2015 None on record
Jennifer Maclennan Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Barbara Sharrock Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Rosemary Elias Trustee 01 January 2020
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN DORKING Received: On time
WEST WEALD AREA QUAKER MEETING Received: On time
JOYCELIN DAWES Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Jenny Routledge Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Anne Bennett Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
John Dash Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
PETER ALLEN-WILLIAMS Trustee 01 September 2016
LINCOLNSHIRE TRAVELLER INITIATIVE Received: On time