ASSOCIATION OF COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITIES

Charity number: 314137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.33m £9.46m £9.45m £11.74m £10.06m
Total expenditure £8.50m £9.43m £10.04m £11.51m £11.16m
Income from government contracts £3.36m £3.78m £5.91m £6.57m £6.36m
Income from government grants £1.70m £1.25m £1.08m £1.42m £978.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.00k £1.72m £5.00m £1.06m £81.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £29.00k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.61m £6.98m £8.65m £9.73m £9.02m
Income - Endowments £3.00k £3.00k £5.00m £500.00k £0
Income - Investment £715.00k £766.00k £769.00k £947.00k £962.00k
Income - Other £11.00k £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £161.00k £0 £560.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.38m £9.34m £9.91m £11.33m £10.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £112.00k £91.00k £124.00k £183.00k £196.00k
Expenditure - Governance £137.00k £182.00k £203.00k £186.00k £60.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £128.00k £0 £603.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £112.00k £91.00k £124.00k £183.00k £196.00k
Expenditure - Other £9.00k £0 £0 £0 £0