ST MARYLEBONE CAMP OF WILLIAM ELLIS SCHOOL

Charity number: 325110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.97k £5.93k £1.68k £3.32k £5.73k
Total expenditure £1.83k £6.02k £1.60k £5.06k £8.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A