SUSTRANS

Charity number: 326550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heather Preen Trustee 06 January 2020 None on record
Moray Macdonald Trustee 06 January 2020 None on record
FIONA WESTWOOD Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
GWENDA LYNNE BERRY OBE Chair 01 January 2018
THE FOUNDATION FOR SOCIAL ENTREPRENEURS Received: On time
Frank Swinton Trustee 06 January 2020 None on record
Stuart Mills Trustee 27 July 2018 None on record
Catherine Max Trustee 16 February 2018 None on record
Horace Carter-Allen Trustee 06 January 2020 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Simpson Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record