Accounts and annual returns THE SKELTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 326824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required