THE M J SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 24 January 2017 On time Download