THE TONY AND NORA SOUTHALL TRUST

Charity number: 327195
Charity reporting is overdue by 964 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £3.00k £4.00k £1.50k £3.50k £3.25k
Total expenditure £2.50k £1.70k £1.00k £2.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A