Financial history THE SHANE GISBOROUGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327614
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £1.60k £4.75k £1.33k £1.70k £1.60k
Total expenditure £1.14k £7.11k £1.53k £2.46k £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A