Financial history THE MARANATHA COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 327627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £116.56k £87.30k £65.36k £95.81k £67.31k
Total expenditure £151.86k £121.53k £94.33k £93.91k £68.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £2.67k