Financial history THE CRESCENT TRUST

Charity number: 327644
Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £320.84k £68.84k £14.96k £125.44k £609.34k
Total expenditure £85.62k £70.31k £82.68k £108.90k £121.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £466.22k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.75k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £132.38k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £107.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.47k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.54k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.35k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0