Accounts and annual returns THE MAYFIELD VALLEY ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 327665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window