Financial history THE MAYFIELD VALLEY ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 327665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £126.97k £122.21k £126.30k £122.29k £90.72k
Total expenditure £133.18k £146.10k £137.18k £165.75k £139.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A