Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF BETH LOHAMEI HAGETAOT

Charity number: 327668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 10 March 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 January 2022 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 15 February 2021 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2020 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 23 March 2021 754 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required