Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF BETH LOHAMEI HAGETAOT

Charity number: 327668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £17.00k £48.00k £0 £800 £2.20k
Total expenditure £350 £47.50k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A