Trustees Independent Provider of Special Education Advice
Charity number: 327691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Uriah Smith | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Diana Ore | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sinthubiravi Sivakumaran | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Philip King | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Gubbay | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Amy Kyla Abbott | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Margaret Long | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Russell | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Gillott | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.